EP0709952 - Motor speed control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaji, Toshio 5-1-7, Niina Minoo-shi, Osaka-fu 562 / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Eiji 86-22, Hashimotohiranoyama Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu 614 / JP | 03 /
Matsuo, Keisuke 9-16, Kotobuki-shi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu 572 / JP | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307525.6 | 24.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | JP19940260204 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: JP 26020494 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709952 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709952 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/00, G11B15/46 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
G11B15/46 (EP,US);
H02P23/16 (EP,US);
Y10S388/902 (EP,US);
Y10S388/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Steuerung der Drehzahl eines Motors | [1996/18] | English: | Motor speed control apparatus | [1996/18] | French: | Appareil de commande de vitesse de moteur | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 15.09.1998 | Request for decision received: Priority | 04.02.1999 | Result of request for decision (Priority): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.03.1999 | [1999/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH05197978 ; | [X]JPS6392283 ; | [A]US4745563 (KAKU YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,16,21,24,27,30* abstract *; | [A]WO9209016 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,11,16,21,24,27,30 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0599190 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * figure 1A; claim 1 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931117), vol. 017, no. 624, Database accession no. (P - 1646), & JP05197978 A 19930806 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 6,16,21,24,27 [Y] 11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880906), vol. 012, no. 328, Database accession no. (E - 654), & JP63092283 A 19880422 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 30 * abstract * | Examination | EP0514847 |