EP0710665 - Phosphonosulfonate squalene synthetase inhibitor salts and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pendri, Yadagiri 108 Winston Drive Matawan, NJ / US | 02 /
Chen, Chung-Pin 15 Crestview Drive Kendall Park, NJ / US | 03 /
Kucera, David J. 26 Ivy Hill Road Warren, NJ / US | 04 /
Martinez, Eduardo J. 10 Guilden St. New Brunswick, NJ / US | 05 /
Pansegrau, Paul D. 213 11th Street N.W., Beulah, ND / US | 06 /
Thottathil, John K. 31 Ellsworth Drive Robbinsville, NJ / US | 07 /
Timmins, Peter 5 Heathbank Avenue, Irby Wirral, Merseyside, L61 4XD / GB | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1996/19] | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307618.9 | 26.10.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | US19940333661 | 03.11.1994 Original published format: US 333661 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710665 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A61K31/66 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
C07F9/4056 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07F9/4075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Phosphonosulfonate-Salze als squalen Synthetase Inhibitoren | [1996/19] | English: | Phosphonosulfonate squalene synthetase inhibitor salts and method | [1996/19] | French: | Sels de phosphonosulfonates inhibiteurs de la squalène synthétase | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 19.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/25] | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0595635 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document and particularly examples 40 and 182 *; | [A]US5312814 (BILLER SCOTT A [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | [A] - CARRETERO J C ET AL, "Synthesis of.alpha.,.beta.-unsaturated sulfonates via the Wittig-Horner reaction", TETRAHEDRON (TETRAB,00404020);87; VOL.43 (21); PP.5125-34, UNIV. CATHOL. LOUVAIN;LAB. CHIM. ORG. SYNTH.; LOUVAIN-LA-NEUVE; B-1348; BELG. (BE) [A] 1-4 * page 1102, reaction schemes * |