EP0710501 - Catalyst regeneration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERESTAR HOLDING BV Nijverheidsstraat 1 P.O. Box 9 4550 AA Sas Van Gent / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states CERESTAR HOLDING BV Nijverheidsstraat 1 P.O. Box 9 NL-4550 AA Sas Van Gent / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vercauteren, Ronny Leontina, Marcel Prinses Josephine-Charlotte-laan 88 B-9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | 02 /
Elseviers, Myriam Kwerpseweg 20 B-1910 Kampenhout / BE | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [1996/19] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins, 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307737.7 | 30.10.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | GB19940021894 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421894 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0710501 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0710501 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0710501 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/92, C07H3/02, B01J31/40, B01J38/48 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
B01J31/08 (EP,US);
B01J23/92 (EP,US);
B01J31/1616 (EP,US);
B01J31/34 (EP,US);
B01J31/4007 (EP,US);
B01J38/48 (EP,US);
C07H3/02 (EP,US);
B01J2531/96 (EP,US);
B01J31/0201 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/19] | B01J23/92, C07H3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Katalysatorregenerierung | [1996/19] | English: | Catalyst regeneration | [1996/19] | French: | Régéneration d'un catalyseur | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.2003 | BE | 26.02.2003 | CH | 26.02.2003 | FR | 26.02.2003 | GR | 26.02.2003 | LI | 26.02.2003 | NL | 26.02.2003 | DK | 26.05.2003 | PT | 26.05.2003 | SE | 26.05.2003 | DE | 27.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | GB | 30.10.2003 | IE | 30.10.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
BE | 26.02.2003 | ||
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
GB | 30.10.2003 | ||
IE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
BE | 26.02.2003 | ||
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
GB | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
BE | 26.02.2003 | ||
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
DE | 27.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
DK | 26.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 26.02.2003 | |
CH | 26.02.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 26.02.2003 | |
GR | 26.02.2003 | ||
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 26.02.2003 | |
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
PT | 26.05.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 26.02.2003 | |
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
NL | 26.02.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 26.02.2003 | |
LI | 26.02.2003 | ||
SE | 26.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 26.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04368347 ; | [A]JPS5576894 ; | [DA]US4029878 (KRUSE WALTER M) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2029719 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0009887 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4778531 (DOBLER WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0288847 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO8907602 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document, but especially page 10, lines 1 - page 12, line 7 and claims 1 and 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930517), vol. 017, no. 243, Database accession no. (C - 1058), & JP04368347 A 19921221 (TOUWA KASEI KOUGIYOU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800902), vol. 004, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 023), & JP55076894 A 19800610 (TOWA KASEI KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |