|
21.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |