EP0710929 - Acoustic-assisted image processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1996/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Homer H. 269 Harvey Avenue Lincroft, New Jersey 07738 / US | 02 /
Chou, Wu 22 Greenbriar Drive Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307884.7 | 06.11.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | US19940335285 | 07.11.1994 Original published format: US 335285 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0710929 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0710929 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/70 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
G06T13/205 (EP);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06T13/40 (EP);
H04N19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Akustisch-gestützte Bildverarbeitung | [1996/19] | English: | Acoustic-assisted image processing | [1996/19] | French: | Traitement d'image assisté par acoustique | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 04.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4913539 (LEWIS JOHN P [US]) [X] 1-3,22-25 * column W *; | [X]GB2250405 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,15-18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0603809 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8-12,22,23* column W *; | [X] - MORISHIMA E. A., "AN INTELLIGENT FACIAL IMAGE CODING DRIVEN BY SPEECH AND PHONEME", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, NEW YORK, (19890523), vol. 3, pages 1795 - 1798, XP000089223 [X] 1,4-23,26-35 * the whole document * |