EP0713196 - Electronic display systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilkus, Stephen A. 15 Hickory Lane Lincroft, New Jersey 07738 / US | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1999/05] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1997/29] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1996/21] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department, AT&T GIS Limited, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308023.1 | 09.11.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | US19940339624 | 15.11.1994 Original published format: US 339624 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0713196 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0713196 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713196 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K17/00, H04B17/00 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G09G2380/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/21] | G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/21] | Title | German: | Elektronische Anzeigesysteme | [2003/18] | English: | Electronic display systems | [1996/21] | French: | Systèmes d'affichage électronique | [1996/21] |
Former [1996/21] | Elektronische Anzeigesystemen | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 29.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5260700 (MERCHANT ZAFFER [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 18 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0459659 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 12 - line 27 *; | [A]US4603325 (MARINO FRANCIS C [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 11 * * column 4, line 45 - line 50 * * column 5, line 9 - line 33 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2275848 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *; | [PX]JPH06334583 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06334583 A 19941202 (FUJITSU LTD) [PX] 1,2,5 * abstract * |