EP0712160 - Leadframe with steps, semiconductor device incorporating such a leadframe, and methd for the manufacture of such a leadframe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/20] | Improvements in or relating to semiconductor devices | ||
[2001/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Buford H., Jr. 902 Pinecrest Drive Richardson, Texas 75080 / US | 02 /
Davis, Dennis D. 2106 Mars Drive Garland, Texas 75040 / US | 03 /
Kee, David R. 1513 Ambleside Richardson, Texas 75040 / US | 04 /
Clark, Jesse 1115 McArthur Drive, Apt. No. 3603 Richardson, Texas 75007 / US | 05 /
Laverde, Steven P. 16206 Fallkirk Drive Dallas, Texas 75234 / US | 06 /
Tran, Hai 11480 Audelia, Apt. No. 133 Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308085.0 | 13.11.1995 | [1996/20] | Priority number, date | US19940337798 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 337798 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0712160 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0712160 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712160 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
H05K1/0206 (EP,US);
H01L23/495 (KR);
H01L23/49503 (EP,US);
H01L23/49551 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06165 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H05K1/0204 (EP,US);
H05K2201/066 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09781 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10416 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10689 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/20] | Title | German: | Leiterrahmen mit Stufen, Halbleiterbaulelement und Herstellungsmethode | [2001/40] | English: | Leadframe with steps, semiconductor device incorporating such a leadframe, and methd for the manufacture of such a leadframe | [2001/40] | French: | Cadre de connexion avec des pas, dispositf à semi-conducteurs et méthode de fabrication | [2001/40] |
Former [1996/20] | Verbesserungen in oder in Beziehung zu integrierten Schaltungen | ||
Former [1996/20] | Improvements in or relating to semiconductor devices | ||
Former [1996/20] | Améliorations dans ou relatives à des circuits intégrés | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2001 | 30.11.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 25.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0661408 ; | [X]JPH0529529 ; | [Y]JPS5558557 ; | [X]US5252783 (BAIRD JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,15,16,19 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940608), vol. 018, no. 299, Database accession no. (E - 1558), & JP06061408 A 19940304 (ROHM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-12,15-19 * the whole document * [Y] 9,14 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930615), vol. 017, no. 313, Database accession no. (E - 1381), & JP05029529 A 19930205 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,15,16,19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800628), vol. 004, no. 091, Database accession no. (E - 017), & JP55058557 A 19800501 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 9,14 * the whole document * |