EP0714704 - Separation of plastic components for recycling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Basch, Jeffrey David 210 Avenida Del Rey Evansville, Indiana 47712 / US | 02 /
Gallucci, Robert Russell 1109 Tanglewood Drive Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US | 03 /
Hamilton, Douglas George 10420 North Eastgate Drive Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308184.1 | 15.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | US19940346043 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: US 346043 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0714704 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714704 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B03B5/44, B29B17/02 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
B03B5/442 (EP,US);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0203 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0244 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/006 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/23] | Title | German: | Trennung von Kunststoffen zur Wiederverwerkung | [1996/23] | English: | Separation of plastic components for recycling | [1996/23] | French: | Séparation de matières plastiques pour le recyclage | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 19.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4127572 (KALI UND SALZ AG) [A] 1-6,14,16 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE3210972 (ALU PLAST ALUMINIUM PLASTIK RE [DE]) [A] 1,5,14,16 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 26 * | by applicant | EP0637617 | US4532290 |