EP0714641 - Method for direct laser cutting of metal stents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/23] | Method and apparatus for direct laser cutting of metal stents | ||
[1998/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS, INC. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saunders, Richard J. 596 Marlin Court Redwood City, California 94065 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/23] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308554.5 | 28.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | US19940345501 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: US 345501 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0714641 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0714641 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714641 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, B23K26/08 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
B23K26/073 (EP,US);
B23K26/0823 (EP,US);
B23K26/142 (EP,US);
B23K26/1435 (EP,US);
B23K26/1436 (EP,US);
B23K26/1438 (EP,US);
B23K26/1462 (EP,US);
B23K26/1476 (EP,US);
B23K26/18 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
G05B19/182 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91508 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,US);
B23K2103/05 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45041 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45171 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49996 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/23] | A61F2/06, B23K26/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Direktlaserstrahlschneiden eines metallischen Stents | [1998/31] | English: | Method for direct laser cutting of metal stents | [1998/31] | French: | Procédé pour coupage au laser direct d'un dilatateur en métal | [1998/31] |
Former [1996/23] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Direktlaserstrahlschneiden eines metallischen Stents | ||
Former [1996/23] | Method and apparatus for direct laser cutting of metal stents | ||
Former [1996/23] | Procédé et appareil pour coupage au laser direct d'un dilatateur en métal | Miscellaneous | EPB 1999/22: (deleted) | EPB 1999/22: (deleted) | EPB 1999/22: (deleted) | EPB 1997/46: Teilanmeldung 97202678.5 eingereicht am 01/09/97 | EPB 1997/46: Divisional application 97202678.5 filed on 01/09/97 | EPB 1997/46: Demande divisionnaire 97202678.5 déposée le 01/09/97 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 01.07.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00124280.9 / EP1075823 | EP97202678.5 / EP0815804 | EP97203040.7 / EP0820738 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0540290 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 16,17; | [Y]EP0364787 (EXPANDABLE GRAFTS PARTNERSHIP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 48; figure - *; | [Y]EP0562150 (KUFSTEIN SCHABLONENTECH GMBH [AT]) [Y] 8-10 * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 2; figure - *; | [PX]EP0662307 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [PX] 1-8 * column 6, line 45 - line 51; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0221570 (PALMAZ JULIO C) [A] 1-3,5-7 * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 24; figure - *; | [A]EP0372789 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 8,9,11,16 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 5; figure - *; | [A]GB2070490 (FERRANTI LTD) [A] 8,11,12,16 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - line 15 *; | [A]US4963022 (SOMMARGREN GARY E [US]) [A] 8,13 * abstract *; | [A]US4387952 (SLUSHER ROBERT B) [A] 8,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0624421 (RUSSIAN TECHNOLOGY GROUP [US]) [A] 8,15 * abstract *; | [PA]EP0679373 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [PA] 1-8,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US19900647464 |