EP0716379 - Interface voltage control apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-Ri, Bubal-Eub Ichon-Shi Kyoungki-Do 467-860 / KR | [2007/38] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Hynix Semiconductor Inc. San 136-1, Ami-Ri, Bubal-Eub Ichon-Shi, Kyoungki-Do 467-860 / KR | ||
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | ||
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Symbios, Inc. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | ||
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bullinger, Phillip W. 1316 West, 45th Street Loveland, CO 80538 / US | 02 /
McManus, Michael J. 1306 Silk Oak Street Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gill, David Alan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | Gill, David Alan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Maury, Richard Philip Mark & Clerk, 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308860.6 | 06.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | US19940352331 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: US 352331 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716379 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716379 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716379 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, H03K19/0185 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
H03K19/018521 (EP,US);
H03K19/00 (KR);
H03K19/018592 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/24] | G06F13/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Spannungssteuerung einer Schnittstelle | [1996/24] | English: | Interface voltage control apparatus and method | [1996/24] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour l'asservissement de la tension d'une interface | [2007/16] |
Former [1996/24] | Appareil et méthode de l'asservissement de la tension d'interface | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/44] | FR | 23.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5084637 (GREGOR ROGER P [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 2, line 18 - line 58 * * column 3, line 4 - line 43 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 18 * * column A; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * [A] 4,5,9,10; | [A]US5300835 (ASSAR MAHMUD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 17 - line 65 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 4 * * column A; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5260612 (LEHMANN GUENTER H [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 15 - line 49 * * column A * |