EP0720910 - Film for cook-in applications with plural layers of nylon blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A Duncan, S.C. 29334-0464 / US | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramesh, Ram K. 6 Rosebank Way Greenville, South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
Campbell, Robert W. 323 Berry Shoals Road Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US | 03 /
Woods, Gerald B. 205 Aster Drive Simpsonville, South Carolina 29681 / US | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1996/28] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308931.5 | 08.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | US19940352466 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: US 352466 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720910 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720910 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/34, C08L77/00, B65D81/34 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B65D81/3423 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
B32B2305/72 (US);
B32B2307/704 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2307/736 (US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L23/00 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/28] | Title | German: | Film zum Kochen in der Verpackung mit mehreren Schichten aus Nylonmischungen | [1996/28] | English: | Film for cook-in applications with plural layers of nylon blends | [1996/28] | French: | Film pour produits à cuire dans l'emballage à plusieurs couches en mélanges de nylon | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2003 | CH | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IT | 19.03.2003 | LI | 19.03.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | DE | 21.06.2003 | IE | 08.12.2003 | LU | 08.12.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
DE | 21.06.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
LU | 08.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
DE | 21.06.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
DE | 21.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 19.03.2003 | |
LI | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05254063 ; | [X]JPH0538795 ; | [A]US4486507 (SCHUMACHER RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1-25 * claim - ** column 7, line 32 - line 42; examples 4-7 *; | [A]AU2570088 (TRANSPAK IND LTD) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 30 * * page 6, line 21 - line 26 *; | [Y]EP0573306 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [Y] 3,11-21 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0620244 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10,22-25 * page 2, line 48 - line 51 * * page 3, line 29 - line 46 * * page 3, line 50 - line 57 * * page 5, line 46 - page 6, line 30 * * page 6, line 40 - line 44 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 44, Database accession no. 93-348006, XP002002170 & JPH05254063 A 19931005 (GUNZE KK) [X] 1,2,4-10,22-25 * abstract * [Y] 3,11-21 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 12, Database accession no. 93-096662, XP002002171 & JPH0538795 A 19930219 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [X] 1,2,4-8,22-25 * abstract * |