EP0720148 - Method for noise weighting filtering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | For all designated states Wierzynski, Casimir 27 Bleecker Street 2/b New York NY 10012 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | ||
For all designated states Wierzynski, Casimir 27 Bleecker Street 2/b New York, NY 10012 / US | |||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | ||
For all designated states Wierzynski, Casimir 376 Broadway No. 22C New York, New York 10013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoham, Yair 645 Johnston Drive Watchung, New Jersey 07060 / US | 02 /
Wierzynski, Casimir 27 Bleecker Street #2B New York, New York 10012 CW / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309006.5 | 12.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940367526 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: US 367526 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720148 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720148 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G10L19/0208 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/27] | G10L5/06, G10L7/08, G10L9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur gewichteten Geräuschfilterung | [1996/27] | English: | Method for noise weighting filtering | [1996/27] | French: | Méthode pour le filtrage pondéré du bruit | [2002/19] |
Former [1996/27] | Méthode pour la filtration pondèrée du bruit | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.01.2003 | SE | 15.04.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0240330 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [X] 1; | [X]EP0240329 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [X] 1; | [A]EP0575815 (ATR AUDITORY VISUAL PERCEPTION [JP]) [A] 1,3,9,10,11,16,21 | Examination | WO9611647 | EP0289080 |