EP0720966 - Recovery of carbon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER UK LIMITED Cedar House, 39 London Road Reigate Surrey RH2 9QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states MESSER UK LIMITED Cedar House, 39 London Road Reigate, Surrey RH2 9QE / GB | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states MG GAS PRODUCTS LIMITED Cedar House, 39 London Road Reigate, Surrey RH2 9QE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cockerill, Peter E. Sansgate, Orchard Way Warninglid, West Sussex RH17 5ST / GB | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309337.4 | 21.12.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | GB19950000114 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9500114 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720966 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720966 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/20, F25J3/08, C12F3/02 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
C12F3/02 (EP);
C01B32/50 (EP);
F25J3/08 (EP);
F25J2200/02 (EP);
F25J2215/04 (EP);
F25J2215/80 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/28] | Title | German: | Rückgewinnung von Kohlendioxid | [1996/28] | English: | Recovery of carbon dioxide | [1996/28] | French: | Récupération de dioxyde de carbone | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4460395 (NOBLES JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * claim 1 * * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 18 - line 40 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0194795 (KINS DEVELOPMENTS LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9207933 (HEINEKEN TECHNISCHE BEHEER BV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - MORRISON N. & AL., "Assay and control of dimethyl sulfide in brewery carbon dioxide", JOURNAL OF AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, vol. 39, no. 4, pages 131 - 135, XP000566283 [A] 1 * the whole document * |