EP0722658 - Storage stable biocide composition and process for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matz, Gary F., c/o Calgon Corporation Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US | 02 /
Richardson Paul F., c/o Calgon Corporation Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/25] | McCormack, Derek James Calgon Corporation, European Patent Department, ECC International LTD, c/o John Keay House St.-Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | ||
Former [1996/30] | McCormack, Derek James ECC International Limited 1015 Arlington Business Park Theale Reading, Berkshire RG7 4SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309389.5 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | US19950369612 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: US 369612 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722658 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722658 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/44, // (A01N47/44, 47:44, 25:02) | [1996/30] | CPC: |
A01N47/44 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/44, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/44, A01N47/44, A01N25/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | Lagerstabile Biozidzusammensetzung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/30] | English: | Storage stable biocide composition and process for making the same | [1996/30] | French: | Composition biocide stable au stockage et procédé de sa préparation | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.02.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   18.02.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2030093 (BOUSQUET EUCLID W, et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, column 2, line 34 * * page 1, column 2, line 41 - line 50 *; | [X]DE1085374 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1,2 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US2966512 (GAGLIARDI GEORGE N) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 51 - line 54 *; | [A]US3312589 (ENTLEY WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 8 *; | [X]GB1109431 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 47 - line 65 * * page 2, line 29 - line 30 *; | [DA]US3628941 (MARKS ALFRED FINLAY) [DA] 1-3* column 1, line 54 - line 59 *; | [X]AU429670B (AMERICAN CYANAMID) [X] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,5 *; | [X]EP0252278 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 19 *; | [X]FR2633308 (HENKEL FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 25 - line 34 * * page 6, line 2 - line 10 * |