EP0720131 - A self-service transaction terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Graham I. 53 Castle Street Tayport, Fife, Dundee DD6 9AA / GB | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/27] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95309412.5 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | GB19940026325 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9426325 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720131 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720131 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, G09B21/00 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
G07F19/20 (EP);
G07F19/201 (EP);
G07F19/205 (EP);
G09B21/003 (EP);
G09B21/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/27] | Title | German: | Selbstbedienungs-Transaktions-Terminal | [1996/27] | English: | A self-service transaction terminal | [1996/27] | French: | Terminal de transactions libre-service | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61150065 ; | [A]WO9303468 (ANAGNOSTOPOULOS A PANAGIOTIS [GR]) [A] 1,5,7,9 * abstract *; | [AP]US5385770 (JULNES JON N [US]) [AP] 1,2,7 * column A; figure 1; claim 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 37 *; | [A]US5185515 (NISHIBE KUNIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,4-6,9 * column W *; | [A]EP0535417 (IBM [US]); | [A]FR2505528 (FREAL MARCEL [FR]); | [A]EP0588231 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861127), vol. 010, no. 351, Database accession no. (P - 520), & JP61150065 A 19860708 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1,4-9 * abstract * |