EP0664624 - Method and device for transmission and switching of packets in an optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Etablissement autonome de droit public, 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auffret, René 48 Kernu - Louannec F-22700 Perros Guirec / FR | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/19] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/30] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400023.8 | 05.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | FR19940000114 | 07.01.1994 Original published format: FR 9400114 | [1995/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0664624 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0664624 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/08, H04Q11/00 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04J14/08 (EP,US);
H04J14/0212 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0009 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0011 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung und Durchschaltung von Paketen in einem optischen Netzwerk | [1995/30] | English: | Method and device for transmission and switching of packets in an optical network | [1995/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transmission et d'aiguillage de paquets dans un réseau optique | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3604936 (KOMPFNER RUDOLF) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0497667 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 3 * column 1, line 1 - line 7 * * column 4, line 38 - line 51 * * column 6, line 13 - line 24 * * column 7, line 24 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [Y] - L.T. WU ET AL., "DYNAMIC TDM - A PACKET APPROACH TO BROADBAND NETWORKING", ICC 89, SEATLLE, US, (19870610), vol. 3, pages 1585 - 1592 [Y] 1-4 * page 1588, column L, line 36 - line 48 * * page 1589, column L, line 2 - line 12 * * page 1589, column L, line 55 - column R, line 16 * * page 1591, column R, line 22 - page 1592, column L, line 5 * * page 1592, column L, line 26 - line 46; figures 3-6 * | [Y] - A. GANZ ET AL., "A time-wavelength assignment algorithm for a WDM star network", INFOCOM '92, FLORENCE, IT, (19920504), vol. 1, pages 2144 - 2150, XP000300342 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 2144, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2144, column R, paragraph 4 - page 2145, column R, line 17; figure 1 * | [A] - A.S. ACAMPORA, "A HIGH CAPACITY METROPOLITAN AREA NETWORK USING LIGHTWAVE TRANSMISSION AND TIME-MULTIPLEXED SWITCHING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (199010), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1761 - 1770, XP000176871 [A] 1,2 * page 1762, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.61447 | [A] - K. INOUE ET AL., "Wavelength Conversion Experiment Using Fiber Four-Wave Mixing", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (199201), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 69 - 72, XP000244575 [A] 4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.124880 |