EP0664663 - Variable arc current electronic ballast for fluorescent lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DON WIDMAYER & ASSOCIATES, INC. 4709 Locust Hill Court Bethesda Maryland 20814 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states DON WIDMAYER & ASSOCIATES, INC. 4709 Locust Hill Court Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmayer, Don Frederick 4709 Locust Hill Court Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | 02 /
Chiu, Alex Weitzu 2895 Glenora Lane Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400077.4 | 16.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | US19940183368 | 19.01.1994 Original published format: US 183368 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664663 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664663 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/392 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
H05B41/3922 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät zum Verändern des Lampenstroms von Leuchtstofflampen | [1995/30] | English: | Variable arc current electronic ballast for fluorescent lamps | [1995/30] | French: | Ballast électronique avec courant d'arc variable pour des lampes fluorescentes | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.11.1999 | FR | 10.11.1999 | IT | 10.11.1999 | DE | 11.02.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 10.11.1999 | |
FR | 10.11.1999 | ||
DE | 11.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 10.11.1999 | |
DE | 11.02.2000 | ||
FR | 07.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | DE | 11.02.2000 | |
FR | 07.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | FR | 07.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3624106 (ULLMANN ULO WERK [DE]) [Y] 1,2; | [YA]WO9301694 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2 [A] 3-5; | [XY]DE4015455 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]) [X] 3-6 [Y] 7-10; | [YA]WO9011005 (HAREL JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 7-9 [A] 3-6; | [Y]EP0445757 (TDK CORP [JP]) [Y] 10; | [A]US5027034 (RUBY JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6,8,10; | [A]DE3623306 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 3 |