EP0664271 - Anticollision device and method for mobiles on common rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLLAC Immeuble Elysées-La Défense, 29 Le Parvis 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states SOLLAC S.A. Immeuble Elysées-la-Défense, 29, Le Parvis la Défense F-92800 PUTEAUX / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesage, Michel 29, rue de la Gare F-57330 Zoufftgen / FR | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux BP 405 F-78055 Saint Quentin en Yvelines Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400108.7 | 19.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | FR19940000820 | 24.01.1994 Original published format: FR 9400820 | [1995/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664271 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B66C15/04 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
B66C15/045 (EP,US);
B66C15/04 (KR);
G01S17/931 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kollisionsverhinderung für Fahrzeuge auf gemeinsamen Schienen | [1995/30] | English: | Anticollision device and method for mobiles on common rails | [1995/30] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'anticollision pour mobiles sur un chemin de déplacement commun | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 22.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2185580 (POTAIN SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 3 - line 20 *; | [A]US4030088 (MCCULLOUGH DAVID JACOB) [A] 1,4-6 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 40 - line 56 *; | [A]GB2205463 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 6 - line 14 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 17 * * page 14, line 8 - page 15, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9016853U (ABUS WERNER BÜHNE KG) [A] 7,8* the whole document *; | [A]FR2680897 (GIACALONE FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 28 * |