EP0671539 - Device for holding a blind in its opened out state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FARNIER & PENIN SNC Route de Poitiers, Zone Industrielle No. 2 F-79300 Bressuire / FR | [1995/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jincheleau, Michel 23 avenue du Maréchal Leclerc F-79320 Moncoutant / FR | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400451.1 | 02.03.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | FR19940002589 | 07.03.1994 Original published format: FR 9402589 | [1995/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671539 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/40, E06B9/325, E06B9/66, B60J1/20 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B60J1/2047 (EP);
E06B9/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Festhalten von einem Rouleau in seinem geöffneten Zustand | [1995/37] | English: | Device for holding a blind in its opened out state | [1995/37] | French: | Dispositif de maintien d'un store dans son état déployé | [1995/37] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/45] | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2667350 (FARNIER & PENIN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 15; figure - *; | [A]DE3941877 (BMW) [A] 1 * column 1, line 18 - line 56; figure - *; | [A]EP0087555 (GEBR. HAPPICH GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, line 12 - line 34; figure - * |