EP0681011 - Weldable, prepainted metal sheet and process for making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLLAC S.A. Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13, Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states SOLLAC S.A. Immeuble "La Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13, Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states SOLLAC Immeuble "Le Pacific", La Défense 7, 11/13, Cours Valmy F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guth, Jérôme 11, rue de l'Amiral Ronarc'h F-59140 Dunkerque / FR | 02 /
Hellouin, Rémi 5, Résidence Sylvie F-60500 Chantilly / FR | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR) Immeuble "La Pacific" 11/13 Cours Valmy La Défense 7 TSA 10001 92070 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2008/38] |
Former [1995/45] | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION Immeuble Pacific 11-13, cours Valmy La Défense 7 -TSA 10001 F-92070 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX / FR | Application number, filing date | 95400601.1 | 20.03.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | FR19940005572 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405572 | [1995/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681011 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681011 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/24, B05D3/14, B05D7/14 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B05D3/207 (EP);
B05D7/14 (EP);
C09D5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Schweissbares, vorgestrichenes Stahlblech und Herstellungsverfahren | [1995/45] | English: | Weldable, prepainted metal sheet and process for making it | [1995/45] | French: | Tôle prépeinte apte au soudage et procédé de fabrication d'une telle tôle | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.11.1998 | DK | 04.02.1999 | PT | 04.02.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
IE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | IE | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 04.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4817535B ; | [A]US4818627 (MELCHER JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 15 *; | [A]EP0556449 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 34 - line 36 * * page 8, line 49 - line 57 * * claims 1,2,5,16 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 73-31904U, & JPS4817535B B1 00000000 (SHIN-NIPPON IRON AND STEE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |