EP0685210 - Femoral condylar and patellar implantable prosthesis and implantation instrumentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS FRANCE 3, Allée du Commandant Mouchotte 91781 Wissous Cédex / FR | [1999/46] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS FRANCE 3, Allée du Commandant Mouchotte F-91781 Wissous Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hummer, Jacques 34, Rue Gambetta F-54000 Nancy / FR | 02 /
Dive, Michel 69, Boulevard Perrier F-13000 Marseille / FR | 03 /
Laurençon, Michel 66, Boulevard des Belges F-69006 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Clauze, Jacques 5, Lotissement Pribat F-64300 Baigts de Bearn / FR | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401018.7 | 03.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | FR19940005888 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405888 | [1995/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685210 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685210 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38, A61B17/14 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61F2/3877 (EP,US);
A61B17/1675 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Femorales kondiläres und patellares Implantat, und chirurgisches Instrument für die Implantierung | [1995/49] | English: | Femoral condylar and patellar implantable prosthesis and implantation instrumentation | [1995/49] | French: | Implant trochléen pour prothèse fémoro-patellaire et son instrumentation de pose | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.11.1999 | IT | 17.11.1999 | DE | 18.02.2000 | BE | 31.05.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 17.11.1999 | |
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | DE | 18.02.2000 | |
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 31.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0613667 (SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS INC [US]) [PX] 1,4 * page 5, line 1 - line 3; figure 2 *; | [A]US3806961 (MULLER M) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4151615 (HALL THOMAS D [US]) [A] 1,3,7 * figure 10 *; | [A]FR2521421 (GRAMMONT PAUL [FR]) [A] 8 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO9104715 (MENDOLIA GEORGES [FR]) [A] 9 * page 5, paragraph L; figures 4,5 * * page 7, paragraph L *; | [A]EP0538153 (IMPACT [FR], et al) [A] 9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0556997 (DOW CORNING WRIGHT CORP [US]) [A] * abstract * |