EP0721242 - Process of manufacturing a surge absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/28] | Surge absorber | ||
[2001/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Binglin F201, Syueiso, 1-14-10 Kamiochiai Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states Yang, Binglin F201, Syueiso, 1-14-10 Kamiochiai Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401164.9 | 19.05.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | CN1995101101 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: CN 95101101 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721242 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721242 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01T4/12 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
H01L24/01 (EP);
H01T4/12 (EP);
H01L2924/12041 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/28] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines Überspannungsableiters | [2001/19] | English: | Process of manufacturing a surge absorber | [2001/19] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un dérivateur de surtension | [2001/19] |
Former [1996/28] | Überspannungsableiter | ||
Former [1996/28] | Surge absorber | ||
Former [1996/28] | Dérivateur de surtension | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Request for further processing for: | 23.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4337928 (PATENT PROMOTE CENTER KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB967563 (BRITISH INSULATED CALLENDERS); | [DA]US4727350 (OHKUBO HITOSHI [JP]) | by applicant | US4727350 |