EP0744589 - Cradle for a tank cannon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states GIAT INDUSTRIES 13, route de la Minière F-78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balbo, Patrick 36, rue François Villon F-18000 Bourges / FR | 02 /
Malassenet, Guy 6, rue des Casseriaux F-18110 Pigny / FR | 03 /
Grelat, Philippe 2, avenue de la Libération F-18000 Bourges / FR | 04 /
Mandereau, Fabienne 19, route de Mehun F-18500 Sainte Thorette / FR | [1996/48] | Application number, filing date | 95401208.4 | 23.05.1995 | [1996/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744589 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F41A25/00, F41A3/66 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
F41A3/66 (EP);
F41A25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1996/48] | Title | German: | Wiege eines Panzergeschützes | [1996/48] | English: | Cradle for a tank cannon | [1996/48] | French: | Berceau d'artillerie de char | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/11] | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.07.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4599933 (STONER EUGENE M [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 44; figures 2,4A.4B * * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 47 *; | [A]DE241408 (F. KRUPP); | [A]DE551831 (RHEINISCHE METALLW & MASCHF) |