EP0697458 - Process for making perfuming compositions and products; products obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storet, Isabelle 2, Résidence du Hameau F-38300 Les Eparres / FR | 02 /
Crochemore, Michel 3, rue des Lilas F-69630 Chaponost / FR | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al Rhodia Services Direction Propriété Industrielle 40, Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al RHODIA CHIMIE Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/08] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401415.5 | 16.06.1995 | [1996/08] | Priority number, date | FR19940007811 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9407811 | [1996/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697458 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697458 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11B9/00, C07C69/92 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
C11B9/0061 (EP,US);
C07C69/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1996/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von parfumierter Zusammensetzungen und Produkten; die so herstellen Produkte | [1996/08] | English: | Process for making perfuming compositions and products; products obtained thereby | [1996/08] | French: | Procédé d'obtention de compositions parfumantes et de produits parfumés et produits ainsi obtenus | [1996/08] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 08.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Request for further processing for: | 24.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2001/17] | IE | 05.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5782308 ; | [A]FR2016701 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [XA] - S.ARCTANDER, Perfume and Flavor Chemicals, MONTCLAIR,N.J., S.ARCTANDER [X] 1-16 * 230:iso-amyl vanillate * * 3066:vanillic acid * [A] 1-16 | [A] - R.MRIRANDA-LOPEZ ET AL., "Odor analysis of Pinot Noir grapes of different maturities by a gas chromatography-olfactory technique(Osme)", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE,, CHICAGO US, vol. 57, no. 4, pages 985 - 993,1019 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA,, BASEL CH, vol. 52, no. 1, pages 24 - 32 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820828), vol. 006, no. 165, Database accession no. (C - 121), & JP57082308 A 19820522 (TAKASAGO CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |