EP0691418 - Process for preparing high crystallinity oxide thin film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [1996/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Takao, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401546.7 | 28.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | JP19940174756 | 04.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17475694 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691418 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0691418 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C30B23/02, C30B29/22, C30B29/32, C23C14/24 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
C23C14/0021 (EP);
C23C14/087 (EP);
C23C14/088 (EP);
C30B23/02 (EP);
C30B29/22 (EP);
C30B29/225 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C30B23/02, C30B29/22 (EP);
C30B23/02, C30B29/32 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer hochkristallen dünnen Oxidfilms | [1996/02] | English: | Process for preparing high crystallinity oxide thin film | [1996/02] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un film mince d'oxyde à haute cristallinité | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/14] | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0465303 ; | [X]EP0565455 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [PX]EP0633331 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); |