EP0694536 - 1-Benzyl-1,3-dihydro-2H-benzimidazol-2-one derivatives, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Sanofi-Synthélabo 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Malta, Alain 170 rue de Vignebelle F-34980 Saint Clement de Riviere / FR | 02 /
Mettefeu, Daniel 13 rue du Bosquet F-34790 Grabels / FR | 03 /
Garcia, Georges 27 rue des Aires F-34980 Saint Gely du Fesc / FR | 04 /
Roux, Richard 420 Chemin des Rossignols F-34570 Vailhauques / FR | 05 /
Serradeil-Legal, Claudine 45 avenue des Troubadours F-31570 Escalquens / FR | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401599.6 | 04.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | FR19940008278 | 05.07.1994 Original published format: FR 9408278 | [1996/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694536 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/26, A61K31/415 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D235/26 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/05] | Extension states | LT | 10.07.1995 | LV | 10.07.1995 | SI | 10.07.1995 | Title | German: | 1-Benzyl-1,3-dihydro-2H-benzimidazol-2-one-Derivate, ihre Herstellung und diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1996/05] | English: | 1-Benzyl-1,3-dihydro-2H-benzimidazol-2-one derivatives, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1996/05] | French: | Dérivés de 1-benzyl-1,3-dihydro-2H-benzimidazol-2-one, leur préparation, et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9315051 (SANOFI ELF [FR]) [AD] 1,5 * page 2, line 18 - page 6, line 15 *; | [AD]WO9105549 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,5 * page 1 - page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [AD]EP0477819 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [AD] 1,5 * page 2, column 2, line 5 - page 4, column 5, line 15 *; | [AD]EP0051827 (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1,5 * page 1 - page 2, line 22 *; | [AD]US4209527 (SARGES REINHARD [US]) [AD] 1,5 * column 1 - column 2, line 35 *; | [AD]FR1573739 (MANUFACTURES J. R. BOTTU) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |