EP0692851 - Connection device for electrical conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [1999/31] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jego, Gérard 12, rue Louis Pasteur F-21470 Brazey en Plaine / FR | 02 /
Thierry, Jean-Pierre 36, rue des Espaces Verts, Couternon F-21560 Arc-sur-Tille / FR | 03 /
Nourry, Daniel 14, rue Dom Edmond Martene F-21000 Dijon / FR | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Carias, Alain Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Service Propriété Industrielle, 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Carias, Alain Schneider Electric SA, Service Propriété Industrielle, 33 bis, avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-92000 Nanterre / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401680.4 | 12.07.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | FR19940008836 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: FR 9408836 | [1996/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692851 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692851 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R31/00, H01R13/15 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
H01R13/15 (EP);
H01R13/631 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für elektrische Leiter | [1996/03] | English: | Connection device for electrical conductors | [1996/03] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour conducteurs électriques | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2432777 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 28; figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR1225403 (NEIDECKER) [A] 1-3,5 * page 5, column L, line 22 - line 30; figure 9 *; | [A]US3482201 (SCHNECK MARTIN) [A] 1,4 * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2035717 (ELECTRICAL CONTACT ASSEMBLIES) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 122 - line 125; figures 1,4 *; | [A]GB869810 (BROOKHIRST SWITCHGEAR LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 4; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2432777 |