EP0696431 - Device for fixing a grip to a cooking vessel and cooking vessel comprising such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois F-69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raoult, Philippe 315 Chemin des Derants F-74370 Pringy / FR | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard, et al Novagraaf Technologies SA 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Keib, Gérard, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain SA 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401809.9 | 01.08.1995 | [1996/07] | Priority number, date | FR19940009913 | 10.08.1994 Original published format: FR 9409913 | [1996/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696431 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696431 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47J45/06 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
A47J45/061 (EP,US);
Y10S16/41 (US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT, LU, NL [1996/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Griffes an einen Küchenbehälter und Küchenbehälter mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1996/07] | English: | Device for fixing a grip to a cooking vessel and cooking vessel comprising such a device | [1996/07] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer une queue à un récipient culinaire et récipient culinaire comportant un tel dispositif | [1996/07] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1997 | [2000/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU1079570D (MASARU YAMAZAKI) [A] 5* page 4; figures 1,4; claims 6,7 *; | [DA]GB2118431 (CHAMBERS RICHARD MICHAEL) [DA] 1-4,7 * page 1, line 31 - line 79; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9207076U (HEINRICH BAUMGARTEN KG) [A] 1,2,7 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 14; figure - *; | [A]FR2683136 (BERROD SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,7 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 20; figure 2 * | by applicant | GB2118431 |