EP0699855 - Control device for an automotive gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1998/24] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fouillet, Serge 45 Avenue Léon Jouhaux F-70400 Hericourt / FR | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401913.9 | 18.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | FR19940010484 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: FR 9410484 | [1996/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699855 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699855 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, F16H3/38 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
F16H63/302 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/10] | Title | German: | Schaltungseinrichtung für das Stufengetriebe eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1996/10] | English: | Control device for an automotive gearbox | [1996/10] | French: | Dispositif perfectionné de commande d'une boîte de vitesses de véhicule automobile | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]FR2702263 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [PA] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4320224 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0501845 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column A; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2174465 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2673254 |