EP0709402 - Glycosylated latex or mineral oxide particle, process for the preparation of such a particle and use thereof as a biological detection agent or as an affinity chromatography agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/18] | Latex particles of glycosylated mineral oxides, process for the preparation of such particles and use thereof as biological detecting agents of affinity chromatography agents | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK S.A. 201 rue Carnot 94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states MERCK EUROLAB S.A. 201 Rue Carnot 94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states SOCIETE PROLABO 54 rue Roger Salengro F-94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Joel Résidence Mermoz, Bât. G, 15 avenue Marie Amélie F-60500 Chantilly / FR | 02 /
Vaslin, Sophie Parc des bords de Marne, 53 Bis quai Ferber F-94360 Bry-sur-marne / FR | 03 /
Larpent, Chantal 12, allée des Gardes Royales F-78000 Versailles / FR | [1996/23] |
Former [1996/18] | 01 /
Richard, Joel Résidence Mermoz, Bât. G, 15 avenue Marie Amélie F-60500 Chantilly / FR | ||
02 /
Vaslin, Sophie Parc des bords de Marne, 53 Bis quai Ferber F-94360 Bry-sur-marne / FR | |||
03 /
Larpent, Chantal 108 Boulevard de la Reine F-78000 Versailles / FR | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Ahner, Francis CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402403.0 | 26.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | FR19940012970 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: FR 9412970 | [1996/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709402 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709402 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08F257/02, C08F292/00 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C08F292/00 (EP,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
Y10S977/775 (EP,US);
Y10S977/882 (EP,US);
Y10S977/897 (EP,US);
Y10S977/904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2989 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F257/02, C08F220/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | Glykosilierte Latex- oder Mineraloxyd-Teilchen, Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem solchen Teilchen und Verwendung dessen als biologisches Nachweismittel oder als Affinitätschromatographie-Mittel | [2001/32] | English: | Glycosylated latex or mineral oxide particle, process for the preparation of such a particle and use thereof as a biological detection agent or as an affinity chromatography agent | [2001/32] | French: | Particule de latex ou d'oxyde minéral glycosylée, procédé de préparation d'une telle particule et utilisation de celle-ci en tant qu'agent de détection biologique ou de chromatographie d'affinité | [1996/18] |
Former [1996/18] | Latexteilchen oder glykosylierte Mineraloxyde, Verfahren zur Herstellung von diesen Teilchen und Verwendung als biologisches Nachweismittel oder Affinitätschromatographie-Mittel | ||
Former [1996/18] | Latex particles of glycosylated mineral oxides, process for the preparation of such particles and use thereof as biological detecting agents of affinity chromatography agents | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0001223 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 3; claims 1-44 *; | [A]GB816510 (ROHM & HAAS) [A] 1 * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 109; claims 1-16 *; | CS271706 [ ] (V. KERY); | [A]EP0227054 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]FR2677366 (PROLABO SA [FR]) [A] 1 * claims 1-27 * | [A] - V. KERY, "N-GLYCOSYL DERIVATIVES OF ETHYLENE DIMETHACRYLATE-CROSSLINKED HYDROXYETHYL METHACRYLATE-METHACRYLOYLOXY-ACETOHYDRAZIDE COPOLYMER", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931115), vol. 119, no. 20, Database accession no. 204179a, page 23 [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | - M.T. Charreyre et al: "Preparation and characterization of polystyrene latexes bearing disaccharide surface groups"; COLLOID & POLYMER SCIENCE, Vol. 271 (1993), pages 668-679. | - M.C. Davies et al: "Preparation of polymer latex particles with immobilized sugar residues and their surface characterization by X-ray Photoelectron Spectroscopy and Time-of-Flight Secondary Ion Mass Spectrometry"; Langmuir, volume 9 (1993), number 7, pages 1637-1645. |