EP0718639 - Process and device for detecting objects distributed in a field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states GIAT INDUSTRIES 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states GIAT INDUSTRIES 13, route de la Minière F-78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnaud, Philippe 18, rue A. Fleming F-45100 Orleans / FR | 02 /
Laine, Loic 55, allée Rivalettes F-18230 Saint Doulchard / FR | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Couderc, Thierry GIAT Industries Division des Systèmes d'Armes et de Munitions Direction Technique, service PCS/PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Couderc, Thierry GIAT Industries Division des Systèmes d'Armes et de Munitions, Direction Technique, service PCS/PVD, 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402575.5 | 17.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940015337 | 20.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415337 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718639 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718639 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G01V1/00 (EP,US);
F41H11/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Objekten, welche in einem Gebiet verteilt sind | [1999/02] | English: | Process and device for detecting objects distributed in a field | [1996/26] | French: | Procédé de détection d'objets répartis dans une zone de terrain et dispositif mettant en oeuvre un tel procédé | [1996/26] |
Former [1996/26] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Objekten welche in einem Gebiet verteilt sind | Examination procedure | 19.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.01.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 | 17.01.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.10.1999 | NL | 13.10.1999 | CH | 30.11.1999 | LI | 30.11.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 30.11.1999 | |
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 17.06.2000 | |
LI | 17.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2548041 (COMATRA EXPORT) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US3815704 (EISNER E) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0383650 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9010866 (CAULFIELD DAVID DONALD [CA]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]FR2618540 (DESVIGNE CLAUDE JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0591061 (UNIV PARIS VII [FR]); | [A]GB2259146 (US ENERGY [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2696573 |