EP0714851 - Process for the synthesis of zeolites and of mesoporous solids from one homogeneous solution in an half-open system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benazzi, Eric 67, boulevard de la République F-78360 Montesson / FR | 02 /
Le Goff, Pierre-Yves Résidence Edison, 9, rue des Frères Lumières F-68350 Brunstatt / FR | 03 /
Caullet, Philippe 4, rue Kellermann F-68110 Illzach / FR | 04 /
Guth, Jean-Louis 59, rue Bellevue F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | [1998/28] |
Former [1996/23] | 01 /
Benazzi, Eric 67, boulevard de la République F-78360 Montesson / FR | ||
02 /
Le Goff, Pierre-Yves Résidence Edison, 9 rue des Frères Lumières F-68350 Brunstatt / FR | |||
03 /
Caullet, Philippe 4, rue Kellermann F-68110 Illzach / FR | |||
04 /
Guth, Jean-Louis 59, rue Bellevue, Brunstatt F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | Representative(s) | Andreeff, François INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE Patent Division 4 rue de la Paroisse 78400 Chatou / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Andreeff, François INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402673.8 | 27.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | FR19940014499 | 30.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9414499 | [1996/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0714851 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0714851 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714851 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/02, C01B33/20, C01B33/18 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/04 (EP,US);
C01B39/24 (EP,US);
C01B39/305 (EP,US);
C01B39/40 (EP,US);
C01B39/48 (EP,US);
Y10S423/21 (EP);
Y10S423/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, NL [1996/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zeolithen und von mesoporösen festen Körpern aus einer homogenen Lösung in einem halbgeöffneten System | [1996/23] | English: | Process for the synthesis of zeolites and of mesoporous solids from one homogeneous solution in an half-open system | [1996/23] | French: | Procédé de synthèse de zéolithes et de solides mésoporeux à partir d'une solution homogène en système semi-ouvert | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0473509 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [D]FR2666321 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [A]EP0131898 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |