EP0719729 - Method and apparatus for treatment of a gas mixture containing ozone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gastiger, Michel 4 avenue d'Orgeval F-91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
Renault, Philippe 23 rue Champ Lagarde F-78000 Versailles / FR | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402761.1 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | FR19940015716 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415716 | [1996/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719729 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719729 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/10, C01B13/11 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C01B13/10 (EP,US);
C01B13/11 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Ozon enthaltender Gasmischung | [1996/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for treatment of a gas mixture containing ozone | [1996/27] | French: | Procédé et installation de traitement d'un mélange gazeux comprenant de l'ozone | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US2872397 (KIFFER ALFRED D) [DX] 19-24 * column 2, line 18 - line 45 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 6 * * figure 1 * * IDEM * [A] 1,6-8,10,15,17; | [A]DE3628236 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - line 45 *; | [DA]EP0178415 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column W * | by applicant | EP0103144 | EP0178415 | FR2580271 | US2872397 |