EP0719865 - Process for preparing D-lysine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furui, Masakatsu 17-5, Takamidai Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Eiji N 3-4-12-501 Utajima, Nishiyodogawa-Ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Seko, Hiroyasu N 96-24, Oaza-Hikida, Shinjo-cho Kitatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402797.5 | 12.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940322941 | 26.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32294194 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719865 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/08, // (C12P13/08, C12R1:025, 1:185, 1:38, 1:37, 1:265, 1:20, 1:72, 1:80) | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C12P13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von D-Lysin | [1996/27] | English: | Process for preparing D-lysine | [1996/27] | French: | Procédé de préparation de D-lysine | [1996/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 03.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/24] | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9210579 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [DA] 1; | [A]US3527776 (UZUKI TERUO, et al) [A] 1 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [X] 1 | by applicant | WO9210579 |