EP0694938 - Multipolar differential switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillon, Patrick Schneider Electric - Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Sibille, Didier Schneider Electric - Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Hecke, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95410066.5 | 29.06.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | FR19940009658 | 29.07.1994 Original published format: FR 9409658 | [1996/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694938 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694938 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/02, H01H71/02 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
H01H9/0264 (EP);
H01H71/0271 (EP);
H01H2071/0242 (EP);
H02B1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | Multipolarer Differentialschalter | [1998/35] | English: | Multipolar differential switch | [1996/05] | French: | Disjoncteur differentiel multipolaire | [1996/05] |
Former [1996/05] | Multipoläre differenzial Schalter | Examination procedure | 23.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 08.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.1998 | NL | 26.08.1998 | [2003/08] |
Former [1999/22] | AT | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2099631 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]FR2588998 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,4 * [A] 2; | [Y]DE8708744U (LICENTIA) [Y] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 2 *; | [A]DE8807464U (BASSANI TICINO) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [DA]EP0375568 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [DA] 1* column A; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0375568 |