EP0696683 - Molded-in pneumatic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEXTANT Avionique 5/7 rue Jeanne Braconnier Parc Tertiaire 92366 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states SEXTANT Avionique 5/7 rue Jeanne Braconnier Parc Tertiaire F-92368 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almeras, Jean-Claude 4, rue Amblard F-26000 Valence / FR | 02 /
Dezord, Jean-Bernard 22, Chemin Saint Bartélémy F-26500 Bourg les Valence / FR | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 95410083.0 | 08.08.1995 | [1996/07] | Priority number, date | FR19940010090 | 11.08.1994 Original published format: FR 9410090 | [1996/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696683 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F15C5/00, F15B13/00 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
F15B13/0807 (EP);
F15B13/081 (EP);
F15B13/0892 (EP);
F15C5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [1996/07] | Title | German: | Eingegossener pneumatischer Kreislauf | [1996/07] | English: | Molded-in pneumatic circuit | [1996/07] | French: | Circuit pneumatique surmoulé | [1996/07] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/19] | 23.12.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3683960 (KIRSCH JERRY) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8202020 (REISHAUER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2065010 (STEMPEL AG D) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3360008 (PAPALE FRANK A, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1225004 (INGBUERO GEBRUEDER HOLTSCHMIDT); | [A]FR1565111 (ALFRED TEVES) |