EP0694809 - A novel class of grain growth modifiers for the preparation of high chloride (111) tabular grain emulsions (II) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maskasky, Joe Edward, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Parent, Yves, et al Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95420201.6 | 18.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19940281283 | 27.07.1994 Original published format: US 281283 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694809 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694809 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/07, G03C1/005 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G03C1/0053 (EP,US);
G03C1/07 (EP,US);
G03C1/015 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03558 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03594 (EP,US);
G03C2001/7448 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Eine neue Klasse von Kornwachstumsmodifikatoren zur Herstellung tafelförmiger Emulsionen mit hohem Chlorid (III) | [1996/05] | English: | A novel class of grain growth modifiers for the preparation of high chloride (111) tabular grain emulsions (II) | [1996/05] | French: | Une classe nouvelle de modificateurs de croissance des grains pour la préparation d'émulsions de grains tabulaires à haut chlorure (III) | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5183732 (MASKASKY JOE E [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, line 35 - line 46 * * column 9, line 18 - line 47 * * column 11, line 59 - column 12, line 6 * * table III *; | [Y]WO9302390 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 7, line 15 - line 27 * * page 9, line 12 - line 15 * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 10; claim 1 *; | [YA]DE2510464 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [Y] 1-9 * page 3; example 5 * * page 4; example 10 * * claim 1 * [A] 10 |