EP0679327 - Mower with a safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques F-67700 Saverne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieffer, Fernand 32, Rue de la Mésange F-67700 Saverne / FR | 02 /
Walter, René 6, Rue d'Afrique F-57620 Goetzenbruck / FR | 03 /
Neuerburg, Horst 6, Rue des Aubépines F-67700 Saverne / FR | [1995/44] | Application number, filing date | 95440019.8 | 28.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | FR19940005429 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9405429 | [1995/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679327 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679327 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01D75/18, A01D34/66 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
A01D34/661 (EP,US);
A01D75/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/44] | Title | German: | Mähmaschine mit einer Sicherheitsvorrichtung | [1995/44] | English: | Mower with a safety device | [1995/44] | French: | Faucheuse à dispositif de sécurité | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB822604 (DAVID BROWN TRACTORS ENG LTD); | [A]FR1265333 (BORDIER); | [A]DE1582356 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF) [A] 1,32 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]GB1199052 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1-4,9,10,18-20,24,27-29 * page 1, line 56 - page 3, line 41; claims 1-6 *; | [DA]FR2384431 (TAARUP AS MASKINFAB [DK]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]NL9002867 (VOGELENZANG ALEXANDER J) [A] 1,2,30,31,37 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0512602 (ZWEEGERS & ZONEN P J [NL]) [A] 1,2,34 * the whole document * |