EP0678801 - Regulator circuit with Zener reference [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drouot, Sylvie Cabinet Ballot Schmit 18 Place du Forum F-57000 Metz / FR | 02 /
Silvestre de Ferron, Gérard Cabinet Ballot Schmit 18 Place du Forum FR-57000 Metz / FR | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 8 Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | ||
Former [1995/43] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 18 Place du Forum F-57000 Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 95470014.2 | 14.04.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | FR19940004983 | 21.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404983 | [1995/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678801 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678801 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/24, G11C16/06 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
G05F3/24 (EP,US);
G11C5/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Regelschaltung mit Zenerreferenz | [1995/43] | English: | Regulator circuit with Zener reference | [1995/43] | French: | Circuit régulateur avec référence ZENER | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 27.09.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0539593 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 44; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0342581 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]US5191232 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93093410, & US5191232 A 19920317 (SILICON STORAGE TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |