EP0695070 - Multimedia communication apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graziano, Michael J. Route 2, Box 395 Warrenton, VA 22186 / US | 02 /
Hauris, Jon F. 10103 Trinity Lane Manassas, VA 22110 / US | 03 /
Stanley, Daniel L. 827 Brookview Court Manassas, VA 22110 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM France Direction de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Therias, Philippe, et al Compagnie IBM France, Direction de Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1997/12] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1996/05] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 95480086.8 | 13.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19940282376 | 29.07.1994 Original published format: US 282376 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0695070 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0695070 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
G06F13/128 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L49/9031 (EP,US);
H04L49/9057 (EP,US);
H04L49/9063 (EP,US);
H04L49/9089 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L12/433 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6435 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6448 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6489 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Multimediakommunikationsgerät und -verfahren | [1996/05] | English: | Multimedia communication apparatus and methods | [1996/05] | French: | Appareil et méthodes de communication multimédia | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/35] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0459753 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,4,11-13,16,17,19 * page 4, column 5, line 24 - page 5, column 8, line 11 * * page 6, column 9, line 14 - page 11, column 20, line 27 * * claims 1,6,7,15,20-23,27,28 * [A] 2,3,5-10,14,15,18; | [X]EP0551191 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 16,17,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5229993 (FOUDRIAT EDWIN [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * column 1, line 30 - line 65 * * column 2, line 14 - line 17 *; | [A] - SAUNDERS S, "SENDING SYNCHRONOUS DATA OVER FDDI NETWORKS", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, (19930401), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 47 - 48, XP000358347 [A] 1,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - National Semiconductor FDDI Data Handbook, (1991), pages 2 - 133 |