EP0681150 - Airflow control for variable speed blowers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudley, Kevin F. 15 Center Street Cazenovia, New York 13035 / US | 02 /
Pierret, Peter G. 115 Shady Lane Fayetteville, New York 13066 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95630031.3 | 13.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | US19940236824 | 02.05.1994 Original published format: US 236824 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0681150 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0681150 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, G05D7/06, F04D27/02 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
F24F11/0001 (EP,US);
F04D27/004 (EP,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/45] | F24F11/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/45] | Title | German: | Luftmengenregelung für Gebläse mit variabler Drehzahl | [1995/45] | English: | Airflow control for variable speed blowers | [1995/45] | French: | Régulation du débit d'air pour ventilateurs à vitesse variable | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/31] | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4978896 (SHAH RAJENDRA K [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US5202951 (DOYLE EDWARD F [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,12 * the whole document * |