EP0718593 - Device for sensing the displacement of moving members in industrial equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment Korea Co., Ltd. 1 Guyhon-dong Changwon City, Kyongnam Province / KR | [1999/25] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SAMSUNG HEAVY INDUSTRIES CO., LTD 25 Bongrae-dong 1-ga Chung-gu, Seoul 100-161 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Seong Ho 106-1002 Woosung Apt., Namyang-dong Changwon, Kyung Nam / KR | 02 /
Chung, Sang Tae 106-1002 Woosung Apt., Namyang-dong Changwon, Kyung Nam / KR | 03 /
Lee, Dong Soo 103-403 Sungwon Apt., Block 4, Sangnam 2-109 Sapajung-dong, Changwon, Kyung Nam / KR | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95630118.8 | 23.11.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | KR19940036423 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: KR 9436423 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718593 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718593 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/02, G01D5/20, E02F9/20 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
E02F9/2025 (EP,US);
G01B7/30 (KR);
G01B7/023 (EP,US);
G01D5/2013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Detektion der Verschiebung sich bewegender Teile in industriellen Apparaten | [1996/26] | English: | Device for sensing the displacement of moving members in industrial equipment | [1996/26] | French: | Dispositif de détection de déplacement de parties mobiles dans des machines industrielles | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3826408 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 11, line 24 - line 64; figure 10 *; | [A]US5363304 (AWANO KATSUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2272771 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * |