EP0725343 - Error prevention in computer systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fanning, Darragh 23 Holmpatrick Skerries County Dublin / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states Fanning, Darragh 23 Holmpatrick Skerries, County Dublin / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co Dublin / IE | ||
Former [1997/44] | O'Connor, Donal Henry, et al c/o Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [1996/32] | Weldon, Michael James, et al c/o Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95650005.2 | 02.03.1995 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | IE19950000081 | 01.02.1995 Original published format: IE 9581 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725343 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725343 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/14 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
G06F11/004 (EP);
G06F11/1438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1996/32] | Title | German: | Fehlervorbeugung in Rechnersystemen | [1996/32] | English: | Error prevention in computer systems | [1996/32] | French: | Prévention d'erreur dans des systèmes d'ordinateur | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2002 | DE | 11.07.2002 | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 10.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0319034 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0590866 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 32 * * page 7, line 23 - line 52 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0618534 (IBM) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [D]GB2276737 |