EP0724011 - Aqueous cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1997/48] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenoir, Pierre Marie Untermatte 22 CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95810043.0 | 24.01.1995 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724011 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/395, C11D3/20, C11D3/43, C11D1/72 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
C11D3/3947 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D3/3956 (EP);
C11D1/24 (EP);
C11D1/721 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/44] |
Former [1996/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wässrige Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung | [1996/31] | English: | Aqueous cleaning composition | [1996/31] | French: | Composition aqueuse de nettoyage | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 03.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/04] | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.03.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0039002 (HOECHST) [A] 1,10 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0587917 (DR. O. K. WACK CHEMIE) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0426943 (ARAKAWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0338921 (L'AIR LIQUIDE) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,2 * |