EP0671326 - Method and apparatus for wrapping printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. METAVERPA Nieuwegracht 20-22 NL-3763 LB Soest / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states B.V. Metaverpa Nieuwegracht 20-22 NL-3763 LB Soest / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramps, Jan W. Kattestaart 33 NL-1273 VB Huizen / NL | 02 /
de Vlaam, Henk Symfoniestraat 5 NL-1312 ET Almere / NL | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 768 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95810087.7 | 10.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | CH19940000680 | 08.03.1994 Original published format: CH 68094 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671326 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671326 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/14 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B65B25/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umlegen von Umhüllungselementen um Druckprodukte | [1995/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for wrapping printed products | [1995/37] | French: | Procédé et machine pour envelopper des produits d'imprimerie | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE237483 (MONTAGUE MAILING) [Y] 11,12 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 35; figure - *; | [A]DE161545 (CH. OWENS); | [XY]FR327662 (OWENS CHARLES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10,13,14,17,18 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 100; figure 5 * [Y] 11,12,22; | [Y]US3145516 (HANNON CHARLES N, et al) [Y] 22 * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 2; figures 14-16 *; | [A]US3417987 (HANNON WARREN W, et al) |