EP0718211 - Desiccation capsule and article provided with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pont Saint-Germain SA Route de Coeuve 13 2900 Porrentruy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states Pont Saint-Germain SA Route de Coeuve 13 CH-2900 Porrentruy / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pretat, Roland Sur le Mont 150 CH-2932 Coeuve / CH | 02 /
De Boni, Nadia Route de Fontenais 27 CH-2900 Porrentruy / CH | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/26] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 95810338.4 | 23.05.1995 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | EP19940810739 | 20.12.1994 Original published format: EP 94810739 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718211 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/26 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G04B37/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Trockenmittelzelle und damit ausgerüsteter Artikel | [1996/26] | English: | Desiccation capsule and article provided with the same | [1996/26] | French: | Capsule de dessication et article équipé de ladite capsule | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Public notification(s) | CONSTATATION DE LA PERTE D'UN DROIT (REGLE 69(1) CBE) | Pont Saint-Germain SA Route de Coeuve 13 2900 Porrentruy / CH | [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.01.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE551860 (DELTOUR) [A] 1,2,5,7,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1090874 (DE KELPER) [A] 1,9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3567085 (FLORES JAMES G) [A] 1,2,7,12 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0290920 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 19; figure 1 *; | [DA]CH215706 (ROLEX MONTRES [CH]) [DA] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | CH215706 | US2463315 | CH384690 | US3939646 | JPS5861561 | CH314386 |