EP0690037 - Process for reacting a perfluoroalkyl iodide with an olefinic compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1998/19] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deisenroth, Ted 1806 Kingsway Carmel, NY 10512 / US | 02 /
Falk, Robert Allan 35 Glenside Drive New City, NY 10956 / US | 03 /
Haase, Jürg Bettingerstrasse 265 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1996/01] | Application number, filing date | 95810422.6 | 22.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940270068 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: US 270068 | US19950420386 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: US 420386 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690037 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690037 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/275 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
C07C17/275 (EP,US);
C07C319/20 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/20, C07C323/12 (EP,US);
C07C41/30, C07C43/178 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Reaktion von Perfluoralkyljodiden mit olefinischen Verbindungen | [1996/01] | English: | Process for reacting a perfluoroalkyl iodide with an olefinic compound | [1996/01] | French: | Procédé de réaction d'iodures perfluoroalkyliques avec des composés oléfines | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4058573 (KNELL MARTIN) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0194348 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1992), vol. 116, no. 9, Database accession no. 82914b [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - W. HUANG ET AL, CHIN. J. CHEM., (1991), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 373 - 376 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1991), vol. 115, no. 1, Database accession no. 8053h [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - W. HUANG ET AL, CHIN. J. CHEM., (1990), vol. 6, pages 555 - 560 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1987), vol. 106, no. 11, Database accession no. 83935q [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - W. HUANG ET AL, HUAXUE XUEBAO, (1986), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 488 - 494 |