EP0692511 - Method of fabrication of a dyeing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2000/19] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tittmann, Rolf, Dr. Wilhelmweg 26 D-79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
Roth, Ruth Sperrstrasse 57 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [1996/03] | Application number, filing date | 95810439.0 | 04.07.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | CH19940002222 | 12.07.1994 Original published format: CH 222294 | [1996/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692511 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692511 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00, C08G73/06, D06P1/52 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
C08G73/065 (EP,US);
C09B65/00 (KR);
C08G73/00 (EP,US);
D06P1/5278 (EP,US);
D06P1/5285 (EP,US);
D06P5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT [1996/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Färbereihilfsmittels | [1996/03] | English: | Method of fabrication of a dyeing aid | [1996/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'adjuvant de teinture | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57115421 ; | [A]GB1164523 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0102052 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* claim 2 *; | [X]FR2567897 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * claims 1,6,13 *; | [X]EP0431423 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821020), vol. 6, no. 208, Database accession no. (C - 130)<1086>, & JP57115421 A 00000000 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |