EP0702011 - Water soluble piperidine-triazine compounds for use as stabilizers for polyamide fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2001/13] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuso, Francesco, Dr. Bienenweg 8 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 02 /
Reinert, Gerhard, Dr. Weiherweg 1/7 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95810518.1 | 16.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | CH19940002606 | 25.08.1994 Original published format: CH 260694 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702011 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702011 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, D06P1/62, D06M13/358 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
D06M13/355 (EP,US);
D06M13/358 (EP,US);
D06P1/6426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Piperidin-Triazinverbindungen und ihre Verwendung zur Stabilisierung von Polyamidfasern | [1996/12] | English: | Water soluble piperidine-triazine compounds for use as stabilizers for polyamide fibers | [1996/12] | French: | Composés pipéridine-triazine solubles dans l'eau et leur utilisation comme stabilisant pour des fibres de polyamide | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 02.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0466647 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [XD] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0389428 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]DE2730449 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [YD]EP0459950 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [YD] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0209126 (ADEKA ARGUS CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0209127 (ADEKA ARGUS CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0094048 (ADEKA ARGUS CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column W * | [Y] - BORZATTA,V. ET AL., "HALS as Light Stabilizer Agents Against Photodegradation of Polymers", SEM. ORG. SYNTH. SUMMER SCH., "A.CORBELLA",18TH, pages 135 - 153 [Y] 1-12 * siehe insbesondere Seite 140/141, Mechanismus * | [Y] - VALET,A., "HALS light stabilizers: New Developments", PAINT INDIA, vol. 42, no. 7, pages 35 - 39 [Y] 1-12 * siehe insbesondere Seite 35, rechte Spalte, Zeile 11- 14 *. * | by applicant | EP0466647 | EP0459950 |