EP0707002 - UV absorbers, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2003/13] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuso, Francesco, Dr. Bienenweg 8 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 02 /
Reinert, Gerhard, Dr. Weiherweg 1/7 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [1996/16] | Application number, filing date | 95810625.4 | 04.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | CH19940003080 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: CH 308094 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707002 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707002 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/50, C07D251/52, C07D239/48, C07D239/50, C07C233/43, D06M13/358 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D251/50 (EP,KR,US);
C07C233/56 (EP,US);
C07D251/16 (EP,US);
C07D251/70 (EP,US);
D06M13/358 (EP,US);
D06P1/6426 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/16] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UV-Absorber, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1996/16] | English: | UV absorbers, their preparation and use | [1996/16] | French: | Absorbants UV, leur préparation et leur application | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.01.2002 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2002 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 09.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3041330 (ARTHUR COLEMAN RALPH, et al) [DX] 1,2 * example 5; claim 3 *; | [A]DE1568351 (CIBA GEIGY) [A] 16 * claim - *; | [A]DE1618197 (CIBA GEIGY) [A] 16 * Anspruch; Spalten 7-14, Tabellen *; | [A]DE1618196 (CIBA GEIGY) [A] 16 * Anspruch; Spalten 13-42, Tabellen *; | [A]US3906041 (HOFER KURT, et al) [A] 16 * table - *; | [A]US3906033 (BILAND HANS RUDOLF, et al) [A] 16* table - *; | [AD]DE3740650 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * example - *; | [X]EP0388356 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * Beispiele 9, 10; Ansprüche 1,5,7,8,10 *; | [A]EP0552605 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 16 * Seiten 35, 43, 44, 48, 50, 54 *; | [DX]WO9404515 (RAPELLE PTY LIMITED [AU], et al) [DX] 1,13-15 * claims 1-4,15,16 * |